WebOct 1, 2024 · The son of prominent businessman Roberto “Bobby” Ongpin appeared on Friday before a panel of prosecutors at the Department of Justice to answer the illegal drugs charges filed against him by the police authorities. Julian Roberto Ongpin has become a person of interest in the death of Filipino artist Breanna “Bree” Jonson, his girlfriend ... WebOct 11, 2024 · By Nancy Carvajal Two top officials of Alphaland Corporation are set to appear before the National Bureau of Investigation (NBI) Tuesday (October 12) to shed light on the death of Bree Jonson, the girlfriend of bilyonaryo Bobby Ongpin’s son, Julian. Alphaland chief operating officer and corporate secretary Natalie Manalo-Dalupan, and …
Who is Julian Ongpin? - Manila Bulletin
WebFeb 6, 2024 · “Bobby Ongpin is unique,” said Roman Felipe “Manny” Reyes who was himself a former SGV partner before moving on to co-found and chair the Reyes Tacandong & Co. auditing firm. “He is a ... WebFeb 28, 2024 · Roman’s son, Alfonso, was the father of Bobby’s father, Luis Ongpin, a stockbroker. One, Bobby Ongpin built the Philippines’ premier high-end property development company, Alphaland Corporation. sram gx eagle 1x12
Nasaan si Julian? NBI unsure of Ongpin scion’s whereabouts in PH
WebJaime Velayo Ongpin (June 15, 1938 – December 7, 1987) was Minister of Finance of the Philippines under President Cory Aquino, appointed in 1986 after having played an … Roberto Velayo Ongpin (January 6, 1937 – February 5, 2024) was a Filipino businessman who served as the Minister of Commerce and Industry (initially as Minister of Industry) during the Marcos administration. His younger brother Jaime served as the Minister of Finance of the Philippines under … See more Ongpin was born on January 6, 1937. He was the second of seven children by Luis Roa Ongpin and Lourdes Morales Velayo. He grew up in the neighborhood of Pinaglabanan in San Juan, which was then a suburb of the See more Ongpin died in his sleep on Balesin Island, Polillo, Quezon, on February 4, 2024, at age 86. See more • ISM COMMUNICATIONS CORP. Retrieved December 4, 2011. See more Sycip, Gorres, Velayo & Company After moving back to the Philippines in 1963, Roberto V. Ongpin was recruited by his maternal uncle, … See more Business ventures Belle Corporation and Atok-Big Wedge After the fall of the Marcos government, Ongpin pursued his own business interests. Among his first ventures was Belle Corporation with Benito Tan Guat. As chief executive … See more WebMar 17, 2024 · Many Ongpin cousins have worked for Alphaland, Bobby Ongpin’s development company, at one point or another, but Miguel knew from experience that for his generation, it can be very frustrating to be tasked to embark on a project only to have it shelved or replaced. sherly arvizu